HI SB522 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB522

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Accounting and General Services to establish and operate a child care center pilot program on Oahu for eligible children of state employees, one in or near the state capitol and one in Kapolei. Appropriates funds. Repeals on 6/30/2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to GVO/HMS, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB522 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO/HMS, WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback