HI SB522 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant pursuant to chapter 42F, Hawaii
Title
Ha Ola O Waipio Valley; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=522&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB522_.HTM |