HI SB519 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources to partner with the Hawaii agriculture community to establish a food safety certification training program to provide assistance to small- and medium-sized farms in obtaining a United States Department of Agriculture Good Agricultural Practices certification or an equivalent certification. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Food Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 167) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback