HI SB519 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that citizen complaints against a police officer that involve allegations of domestic violence against a family or household member on the part of the police officer shall not be required to be in writing or sworn to by the complainant. (SB519 HD1)
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3). |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1229) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 03-17-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 670) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB519 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
HB681 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
HB681 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).