HI SB513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB513
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an expeditious adjudication system for the processing of fireworks infractions. Increases the fireworks display permit fee and the fine for certain fireworks violations. Clarifies what constitutes a separate violation. Increases the penalty for removing or extracting the pyrotechnic contents. Authorizes the sheriff division to enforce the fireworks control law. Requires the attorney general to establish an explosion detection technology working group. Requires the department of public safety to develop and implement a web-based reporting tool for illegal fireworks. Appropriates funds. Effective 5/6/2137. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Enforcement Of Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Rhoads, Kidani Co-Chairs. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 226) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB513 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229.