HI SB505 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB505
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from the university of Hawaii bond fund for renovations, repairs, and improvements to the John A. Burns school of medicine.
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Revenue Bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB505 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=505&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB505_.HTM |