HI SB503 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to establish a refrigerant management program to reduce emissions of high global warming potential refrigerants and any refrigerant that is an ozone depleting substance from operation of stationary, commercial, and industrial refrigeration equipment responsible and adopt rules for the regulation of the use of such refrigerants. Requires the state building code council to establish codes and standards consistent with the goal of reducing greenhouse gas emissions associated with hydrofluorocarbons when updating the state building code. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Climate Change Mitigation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS/PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
HB197 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
HB197 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction
High Global Warming Potential Refrigerants
Ozone Depletion Substances
Refrigerant Management Program
State Building Code
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction
High Global Warming Potential Refrigerants
Ozone Depletion Substances
Refrigerant Management Program
State Building Code
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=503&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB503_.HTM |