HI SB502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB502
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the legislative reference bureau to develop a spreadsheet informing members of the legislature on the status and content of all reports to be submitted to the legislature as required by law or requested by legislative concurrent resolution. Requires the legislative reference bureau to inform the legislature of all annual and other reports required by law to be submitted to the legislature or requested by legislative concurrent resolution that were not timely submitted. Requires reporting entities to submit a copy of all reports submitted to the legislature to the legislative reference bureau. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Government Accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 159) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1138) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27