HI SB50 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 156, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 156, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii for the Hawaii Nutrition Employment and Training Program to include materials and supplies and the hiring of seven full-time equivalent instructional and student support positions. (SB50 HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act 156, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2019-07-01 | House | Act 156, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 906). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-17-19. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-17-19. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 723). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2187) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-19 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-19. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1645), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2019-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 735) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/HRE, WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HMS. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HMS. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS will hold a public decision making on 02-07-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |