HI SB493 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB493
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii agriculture and forest carbon positive incentive program. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Tuesday, 03-16-21 10:30AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 68) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB493 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Agriculture and Forest Carbon Positive Incentive Program
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Hawaii Agriculture and Forest Carbon Positive Incentive Program
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority