HI SB491 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 030, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 030, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the Department of Agriculture. Effective on 6/28/2019. (SB491 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Act 030, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131). |
2019-04-29 | House | Act 030, on 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 894). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2216) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi, Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 962) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |