HI SB489 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
Hearing: Feb 22 @ 9:00 am in Conference Room 016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an offense of knowingly capturing, taking, possessing, abusing, entangling, or killing a shark in state marine waters, along with penalties and fines. Expands the existing prohibition on knowingly capturing or killing a manta ray in state marine waters to apply to all rays and to also include knowingly taking, possessing, abusing, or entangling a ray. Provides certain exemptions. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Shark And Ray Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-04SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WTL, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback