HI SB488 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB488

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of agriculture to conduct a study on what metrics to use to accurately determine how much food is locally produced. Directs the department of agriculture to consult with a firm that specializes in food security metrics and with the department of business, economic development, and tourism to recommend a food security metric system for Hawaii. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Local Food Production.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to AEN/EET, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB488 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback