HI SB488 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 196, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 196, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows courts to authorize an individual or entity other than a sheriff deputy or an officer to provide technical assistance to the deputy sheriff or officer in examining an electronic device or storage media that is the subject of a search warrant. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Search Warrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 196, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 196, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50). |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:50AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-17. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-03-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-31-17. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-30-17. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 378). |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1390) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morikawa. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/ETT. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB300 (Same As) 2017-02-21 - Referred to JDL.