HI SB486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission to review and report on the concept of food labeling based on the food's environmental impact and make recommendations on how to implement this type of food labeling. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Food Labeling.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB486 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.