HI SB483 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB483

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of private lands for the ohana zones pilot program. Provides additional time for the implementation of the ohana zones pilot program. Extends sunset dates of the Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment and Medical Respite pilot programs of the Department of Human Services to 6/30/2020. Requires reports to the Legislature. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homelessness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from HMS/HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:55PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-29SenateRe-Referred to HMS/HOU/GVO, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS/HOU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB483 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback