HI SB481 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes medical cannabis dispensaries to distribute cannabis propagules and cuttings to individuals authorized to cultivate cannabis plants for medical use, subject to quantity limits and quality requirements.
Title
Relating To Cannabis For Medical Use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH, JDC.
HB482 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB482 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=481&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB481_.HTM |