HI SB481 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for the working disabled adults eligibility group to expand access to medicaid for workers with disabilities. Requires the department of human services to implement the group by July 1, 2015. (SD1)
Title
Working Disabled Adults Eligibility Group; Medicaid; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 4:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HSH/HTH/HEA, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1236 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 229.