HI SB477 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB477
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the governing body of a county to create, by ordinance, a process for the recordation and enforcement of solar easements. Allows counties to require individuals claiming a solar right to record that right by filing a declaration with the county clerk. Permits the governing body of a county to require, by ordinance, the trimming of vegetation that blocks solar radiation from solar energy devices. Authorizes the ordinance to include a designation for the cost of trimming.
Title
Relating To Solar Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB368 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB477 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/PSM, JDC.
SB477 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=477&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB477_.HTM |