HI SB473 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB473
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a vulnerable coastal property purchaser statement to be executed by the purchaser or transferee with the sale or transfer of vulnerable coastal real estate. Requires filing of statement with Bureau of Conveyances.
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN/JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB596 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB473 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SB473 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=473&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB473_.HTM |