HI SB47 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB47
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any new contract entered into by the Office of Elections for equipment or services relating to preparing ballots or counting votes include the capability to randomize the names of candidates appearing on the ballot if technologically possible. Requires candidate names to be randomized on ballots, to the greatest extent possible. Requires the Office of Elections to inform voters and candidates, by a method suited for the voting system, that the names of candidates may not be in alphabetical order. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Arrangement Of Candidate Names On Ballots.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976). |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, San Buenaventura. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 799). |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia voting no (2) and Representative(s) Pierick, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-11 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-13-23. |
2023-04-11 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Todd excused. |
2023-04-11 | House | Floor Amendment No. 6 offered by Rep. Tarnas. |
2023-04-04 | House | Deferred to Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-03 | House | Deferred one day 04-04-23. |
2023-03-31 | House | Deferred one day 04-03-23. |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Garcia voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Kim, McKelvey. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-23. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).