HI SB467 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB467
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to conduct a fiscal analysis or study on the restoration of preventative and restorative adult dental benefits to medicaid enrollees. (SB467 HD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To Restore Adult Dental Benefits To Medicaid Enrollees.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1648) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB467 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
HB787 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB335 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB787 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB335 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3