HI SB465 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB465

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the State and its political subdivisions from collecting or using a person's electronic data or metadata by means of a cell site simulator device, except under certain conditions. Prohibits the installation and use of a cell site simulator device without a court order. Specifies conditions when a cell site simulator device may be used. Specifies procedures for application and issuance of an order for a cell site simulator device. Specifies reporting requirements related to cell site simulator device applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electronic Eavesdropping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to GVO/TEC, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB465 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to GVO/TEC, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback