HI SB464 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 013, 04/17/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a property owner or agent to enter adjacent property with albizia trees under certain conditions, including consulting with a tree arborist and providing written notice, to control albizia trees before they become hazardous. Provides a defense to criminal prosecution. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Private Property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 013, 04/17/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
2019-04-22HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 013, 04/17/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
2019-04-01SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 518).
2019-03-29HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-28HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1903), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM/WTL, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB213 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback