HI SB460 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB460
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Tourism Authority to develop a list of unit addresses, including housing units and rental units marketed to the visitor industry for occupancy and to post the list on its website.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/HOU, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB460 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/HOU, CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=460&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB460_.HTM |