HI SB459 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB459

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the construction of tiny homes for residential use within agricultural districts, on farms that are engaged in agricultural production. Provides that a tiny home shall be subject to county ordinances or permitting requirements that are directly applicable to residential uses of tiny homes in agricultural districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing That Supports Agricultural Production.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/AEN/PSM, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB459 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HOU/AEN/PSM, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback