HI SB458 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB458

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning after December 31, 2021, requires the department of taxation to track the revenues generated by each industry in the State and requires a report of its findings to be submitted to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of each regular session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-01-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB458 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-01-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback