HI SB453 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB453

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that no property shall be forfeited unless the owner or interest-holder of the property has been convicted of a covered offense or indicted for a covered offense and there is a significant risk that the property will be destroyed or otherwise made unavailable, and the State has met its rebuttable presumption for forfeiture. Requires the State to show by clear and convincing evidence that a claimant's interest in the property is subject to forfeiture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Forfeiture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB453 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback