HI SB453 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for one ambulance unit each for the County of Kauai and the County of Hawaii, including equipment, supplies, and personnel costs. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 169) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB453 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB313 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
HB313 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).