HI SB451 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state employees from taking any official action directly affecting a business or other undertaking that a parent, sibling, or adult child has a substantial financial interest. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
Ethics Commission Package; Conflicts of Interests
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Evans; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2015-03-16 | House | Re-referred to LMG, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 134) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB188 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.