HI SB450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to LBR/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to LBR/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a nonvoting county representative to participate in collective bargaining negotiations for county employees. Reduces the number of votes the governor has from 4 to 1 for negotiations involving police officers and firefighters. Requires the respective Mayor to provide timely collective bargaining negotiation updates to the applicable county council.
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBR/PSM, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB310 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB450 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM.
SB450 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package
Mayors
Nonvoting Representative
Counties
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package
Mayors
Nonvoting Representative
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=450&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB450_.HTM |