HI SB446 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB446

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a two-year motor vehicle inspection safety check for vehicles ten years of age or newer. Doubles the inspection fee for the two-year vehicle inspection safety check.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Inspections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to TRS/PSM, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB446 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback