HI SB44 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB44
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the attorney general shall represent the University of Hawaii in any litigation, render legal counsel to the university, and draft legal documents for the university. Repeals the authority of the board of regents of the University of Hawaii to appoint or retain general counsel independent of the attorney general to provide legal services for the university. Repeals the general counsel of the University of Hawaii. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Higher Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/JDC, WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HRE. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HRE. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE will hold a public decision making on 02-05-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB44 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.