HI SB439 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii public housing authority to develop public housing projects under a partnership or development agreement with a private party; provides exemptions from chapters 103 and 103D if not prohibited by federal law or regulation; requires annual report to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Private Partnerships
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-09-09 1:15 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH, JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |