HI SB434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to require climate vulnerability assessments for permit applications for projects involving building, transportation, or land use change that may generate significant greenhouse gas emissions. Applies to permit applications filed after 12/31/2020.
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/GVO/PSM, CPH/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/GVO/PSM, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB434 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=434&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB434_.HTM |