HI SB434 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the governor, DBEDT, and the Hawaii state energy office to develop a strategic plan that outlines benchmarks to achieve a one hundred per cent renewable energy portfolio standard. Requires DBEDT to submit the strategic plan to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2018.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-17 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-15-17 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB434 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-17 2:30PM in conference room 225.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=434&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB434_.HTM |