HI SB432 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB432

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and appropriates moneys for a medical respite pilot program to offer medical, nursing, psychiatric, and other care for homeless individuals after being discharged from a hospital. Requires the department of human services to submit an application for an amendment to the QUEST Integration section 1115 demonstration project to expand its QUEST Integration project to provide for the medical respite pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homelessness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee on HMS deferred the measure.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2019-02-01SenateRe-Referred to HMS, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/CPH/HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB432 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback