HI SB427 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB427

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes ranked choice voting for special federal elections and special elections of vacant county council seats. (SB427 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Ranked Choice Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Okimoto.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2177) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates, Hashimoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1555), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB718 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB427 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback