HI SB418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies purposes for which moneys from the electronic device recycling fund may be expended. Makes an appropriation as a grant-in-aid to the counties of Hawaii, Kauai, and Maui for expenses related to the collection services associated with handling and collecting electronic devices for recycling. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Electronic Device Recycling Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1351 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 130, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
HB1351 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 130, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).