HI SB418 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the term "medical marijuana" to "medical cannabis"; transfers the administration of the program from the department of public safety to the department of health; authorizes a registration fee not to exceed $50; establishes the medical cannabis task force; provides for the department of health to license producers to dispense medical cannabis. (SD1)
Title
Medical Marijuana; Medical Cannabis; Department of Health; Dispensaries; Licensed Producer
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 3:30 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH/PSM, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |