HI SB413 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of labor and industrial relations to set workers' compensation medical charges that correspond to the United States Department of Labor Office of Workers' Compensation Programs fee schedule instead of the Medicare Resource Based Relative Value Scale applicable to Hawaii. Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to submit a report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation for analysis of the Act's impact on injured worker's access to treatment. Repeals on 12/31/2024.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB413 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB808 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB808 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=413&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB413_.HTM |