HI SB41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the role of a local contact for operators of transient accommodations under Act 326, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012. For real estate licensure, allows Real Estate Commission to waive one year of the three-year experience as a full-time Hawaii licensed real estate salesperson associated with a Hawaii-licensed real estate broker requirement, with proof of full-time experience in the real estate field for five years up to the time of the experience certification application. (SB41 HD1)
Title
Real Estate; Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Evans, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 512). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har. |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-28 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-31-14 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-27 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-27 | House | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 43 |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-14-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-06-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB23 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.