HI SB41 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the role of a local contact for operators of transient accommodations under Act 326, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012. (SD1)
Title
Real Estate; Local Contacts; Transient Accommodations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-14-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-06-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB23 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).