HI SB41 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset provision of the Hawaii Prepaid Health Care Act. Repeals Act 99, Session Laws of Hawaii 1994, which repealed the sunset provision of the Hawaii Prepaid Health Care Act effective upon the enactment of certain federal law. Upon it approval. (SB41 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Prepaid Health Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Hee, Baker, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 412). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Riviere, Takai, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-04-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ching, Pine. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-11 11:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Re-referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, referral sheet 37 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 61) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 01-31-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to HTH, JDL. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |