HI SB409 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB409

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends section 712-1202, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to include coercion as a means of committing the offense of sex trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sex Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-08SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB175 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB409 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback