HI SB408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB408
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of an autocycle to include a three wheeled motor vehicle that has a handlebar and seat belts. Prohibits operators of a motorcycle, including an autocycle, from carrying any package, bundle, or other article if it prevents the operator from keeping both hands on the handlebars or steering wheel.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB408 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=408&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB408_.HTM |