HI SB405 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB405

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the cesspool conversion tax credit to upgrade or convert cesspools certified by the Department of Health into a director-approved wastewater system. Effective for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cesspools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14SenateRe-Referred to AEN, WAM.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
2023-01-20SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB405 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback