HI SB404 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Act 003, Special Session 2021, 07/06/21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Act 003, Special Session 2021, 07/06/21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the monetary threshold that triggers disclosure of electioneering communications. Repeals the requirement that disclosures of electioneering communications occur on the date of any subsequent expenditures. Classifies election advertisements sent by mail at any postal rate as electioneering communications. Exempts communications that are actual expenditures of an organization from being considered electioneering communications. Excludes candidate and candidate committees from the disclosure requirements. Applies beginning with the 2022 primary election. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Electioneering Communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Act 003, Special Session 2021, 07/06/21. |
2021-07-08 | House | Act 003, 2021 Special Session, on 07-06-21, veto overrride. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Received notice from House that motion to override veto was approved and carried by a 2/3 vote by the members of the House (Hse. Com. No. 2). |
2021-07-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 4) motion to override veto that was approved and carried by a 2/3 vote by the members of the Senate. |
2021-07-06 | House | Veto overridden by 2/3's vote with 43 Ayes; 3 Noes Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso; and 4 Excused Representative(s) Ilagan, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Ohno. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Veto overridden - 2/3's vote: Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha . Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Ihara, Inouye, Moriwaki). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/06/2021 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1296). |
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1296). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakashima, D. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 2:45PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:45PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 516). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1846) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Eli, Mizuno, Woodson. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-24-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-24-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-21. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-19-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 93). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC . |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB144 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.