HI SB404 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB404
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates additional transient accommodations tax revenues to the counties of Kauai, Hawaii, and Maui.
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB404 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
HB517 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 13
HB517 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 13
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=404&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB404_.HTM |