HI SB396 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Act 002, 04/04/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Act 002, 04/04/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes marketplace facilitators as the sellers of tangible personal property, intangible property, or services. Requires other persons who provide a forum for listing of tangible personal property, intangible property, or services and the taking or processing of orders to report information about purchasers to the Department of Taxation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Marketplace Facilitators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Act 002, 04/04/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2019-04-04 | House | Act 002, on 04/04/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505). |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Wildberger, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8). |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1392), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 10) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-28-19. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 670) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM/JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
General Excise Tax
Intangible Property
Marketplace Facilitators
Services
Tangible Personal Property
Use Tax
Intangible Property
Marketplace Facilitators
Services
Tangible Personal Property
Use Tax